Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 54 Today
» 986 Yesterday
» 5562 Week
» 26464 Month
» 26464 Year
» 1248029 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5667 17/11/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31240 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/217/11/1960
31/110/1966
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 267
Cost when Built £
To Service 17/11/1960
Withdrawn 17/01/1990
Time in Service 29 yrs , 2 mths
Cut Up 03/1994
Cut At Birds (at Stratford MPD)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) 17/11/1960
30A Stratford w/e 15/09/1962
32B Ipswich w/e 22/06/1963
30A Stratford w/e 09/01/1965
32B Ipswich w/e 25/09/1965
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 09/10/1965
31B March w/e 11/10/1969
   Withdrawn 17/01/1990

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
10/1966   Reclassified from 30 to 31  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
29/12/1964 Not severe   Train heating boiler burners Not known    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
17/11/1960 To Service To service as D5667
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 267
Allocated to March (31B)
   
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
25/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
10/1966 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/10/1969 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31240    
17/01/1990 Withdrawn Condemned as 31240    
03/1994 Scrapped Broken up by Birds: at Stratford MPD    

prev prev