Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 379 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1764 Week
» 8569 Month
» 115515 Year
» 1337080 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5667 m/e 06/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 06/1926
Withdrawal During 07/1965
Scrapping During 10/1965
Service Life 39 yrs , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BRY Barry 4w/e 30/10/1948
6C Croes Newydd w/e 14/09/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FDL Ferndale m/e 30/06/1948
ALLOC BRY Barry 4w/e 30/10/1948
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 29/09/1963
ALLOC 6C Croes Newydd 5w/e 12/10/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1926 To Service To service as GWR Number 5667
Built at Swindon Works
   
30/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (BRY)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C)    
07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 5667    

prev prev