Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 493 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5094 Week
» 16641 Month
» 416323 Year
» 492910 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5669 24/11/1960
TOPS (31/4) 31410 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/224/11/1960
31/128/12/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 269
To Service 24/11/1960
Withdrawn 30/06/2003
Time in Service 42 yrs, 7 mths , 6 dys
Cut Up 31/12/2004
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) 24/11/1960
30A Stratford w/e 15/09/1962
31B March w/e 09/03/1963
30A Stratford w/e 09/01/1965
31B March w/e 05/06/1965
34G Finsbury Park 2w/e 08/04/1972
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 29/07/1972
CD Crewe Diesel w/e 15/05/1988
   Withdrawn 30/06/2003

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
24/11/1960 To Service To service as D5669
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 269
Allocated to March (31B)
   
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
05/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
12/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
03/1972 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
08/04/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
29/07/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31410    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD)    
30/06/2003 Withdrawn Condemned as 31410    

prev prev