Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 401 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14444 Week
» 79398 Month
» 282062 Year
» 3308915 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5669 |
m/e |
06/1926 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
56xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
235 |
To Service |
During 06/1926 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 07/09/1964 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 3 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CHYS |
Cardiff Cathays |
4w/e |
21/05/1949 |
ALLOC |
88F |
Treherbert |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
ALLOC |
88A |
Radyr |
4w/e |
01/11/1958 |
ALLOC |
88F |
Treherbert |
4w/e |
09/02/1963 |
ALLOC |
88B |
Radyr |
3w/e |
29/06/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
3w/e |
14/09/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1926 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5669 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Abercynon (CV.AYN) |
|
|
21/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (CHYS) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Treherbert (88F) |
|
|
01/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88A) |
|
|
09/02/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Treherbert (88F) |
|
|
22/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88B) |
|
|
07/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5669 |
|
|
11/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|