Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 101 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 101 Week
» 6235 Month
» 234119 Year
» 1455684 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5670 05/01/1961  
TOPS (Tops) 31242 26/01/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/205/01/1961
31/109/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 270
To Service 05/01/1961
Withdrawn 14/12/1998
Time in Service 37 yrs, 11 mths , 9 dys
Cut Up 06/1999
Cut At English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) 05/01/1961
30A Stratford w/e 15/09/1962
31B March w/e 09/03/1963
30A Stratford w/e 09/01/1965
34G Finsbury Park w/e 10/07/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1965
40B Immingham w/e 05/03/1966
   Withdrawn 14/12/1998

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 31B March 5w/e 06/04/1963
ALLOC 30A Stratford 6w/e 09/01/1965
ALLOC 34G Finsbury Park 4w/e 24/07/1965
ALLOC 41A Tinsley 5w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 12/03/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
09/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
10/1971   Dual Braked  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
20/08/1964 Not severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
05/01/1961 To Service To service as D5670
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 270
Allocated to March (31B)
   
26/02/1961 Sightings Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Outside erecting shop.   Link
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
10/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
05/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
09/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
10/1971 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
01/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 31242    
14/12/1998 Withdrawn Condemned as 31242    
06/1999 Scrapped Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan    

prev prev