Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1044 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18847 Week
» 71863 Month
» 191390 Year
» 3218243 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5672 |
24/11/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31244 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
24/11/1960 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 10/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1965 |
|
Tablet catcher apparatus fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 07/1975 |
|
Tablet catcher apparatus removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/11/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
02/01/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
09/03/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
03/06/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/11/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5672 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 272 Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
12/1965 |
Modification |
Modification: Tablet catcher apparatus fitted |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
01/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31244 |
|
|
07/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Tablet catcher apparatus removed |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
31/05/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31244 |
|
|
09/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|