Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5673 01/12/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31245 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/201/12/1960
31/110/1966
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 273
Cost when Built £
To Service 01/12/1960
Withdrawn 05/01/1987
Time in Service 26 yrs, 1 mth , 4 dys
Cut Up 03/1988
Cut At British Rail (at Stratford MPD)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34G Finsbury Park (New) 01/12/1960
40B Immingham w/e 25/03/1967
HM Healey Mills m/e 30/11/1979
   Withdrawn 05/01/1987

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
10/1966   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
04/1969   Dual Braked  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
23/09/1964 Unknown   Train heating boiler burners Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks    
01/10/1964 Severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
01/12/1960 To Service To service as D5673
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 273
Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G)
   
10/1966 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
25/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
04/1969 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31245    
30/11/1979 Allocation Reallocated to Healey Mills (HM)    
05/01/1987 Withdrawn Condemned as 31245    
03/1988 Scrapped Broken up by British Rail: at Stratford MPD    

prev prev