Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 393 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6202 Week
» 13386 Month
» 321367 Year
» 1205748 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5674 01/12/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31246 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/201/12/1960
31/118/11/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 274
Cost when Built £
To Service 01/12/1960
Withdrawn 01/09/1996
Time in Service 35 yrs , 9 mths
Cut Up 02/2000
Cut At English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34G Finsbury Park (New) 01/12/1960
40B Immingham w/e 25/03/1967
   Withdrawn 01/09/1996

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
18/11/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
01/12/1960 To Service To service as D5674
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 274
Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G)
   
25/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
18/11/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31246    
01/09/1996 Withdrawn Condemned as 31246    
02/2000 Scrapped Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan    

prev prev