Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 66 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1013 Week
» 19795 Month
» 268088 Year
» 1152469 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5678 15/12/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31250 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/215/12/1960
31/105/1966
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 278
Cost when Built £
To Service 15/12/1960
Withdrawn 11/02/2000
Time in Service 39 yrs, 1 mth , 27 dys
Cut Up 03/2000
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34G Finsbury Park (New) 15/12/1960
40B Immingham w/e 19/06/1965
34G Finsbury Park w/e 17/07/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 09/09/1967
34G Finsbury Park w/e 07/11/1970
YK York (North) 4w/e 06/10/1973
TI Tinsley w/e 12/01/1974
   Withdrawn 11/02/2000

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
05/1966   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
11/1968   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
15/12/1960 To Service To service as D5678
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 278
Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G)
   
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
17/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
05/1966 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
09/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
11/1968 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
07/11/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31250    
06/10/1973 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
12/01/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
11/02/2000 Withdrawn Condemned as 31250    
03/2000 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev