Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3516 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16922 Week
» 69938 Month
» 189465 Year
» 3216318 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5679 |
22/12/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31251 |
02/02/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31442 |
10/05/1984 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
22/12/1960 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/12/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
09/04/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/12/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5679 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 279 Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
11/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
20/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
01/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
15/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
07/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
24/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31251 |
|
|
10/05/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31442 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
01/09/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31442 |
|
|
09/2004 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|