Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 532 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2439 Week
» 21221 Month
» 269514 Year
» 1153895 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5679 22/12/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31251 02/02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/222/12/1960
31/101/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 279
Cost when Built £
To Service 22/12/1960
Withdrawn 01/09/1993
Time in Service 32 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys
Cut Up 09/2004
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34G Finsbury Park (New) 22/12/1960
40B Immingham w/e 09/01/1965
31B March w/e 11/09/1965
34G Finsbury Park w/e 06/08/1966
41C Wath w/e 20/08/1966
32B Ipswich w/e 12/08/1967
31B March w/e 11/05/1968
34G Finsbury Park w/e 15/03/1969
30A Stratford w/e 07/06/1969
31B March w/e 24/10/1970
   Withdrawn 01/09/1993

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
01/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
09/04/1964 Not severe   Train heating boiler burners Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
22/12/1960 To Service To service as D5679
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 279
Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G)
   
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
11/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
06/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
20/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
12/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
01/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
15/03/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
07/06/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
24/10/1970 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31251    
01/09/1993 Withdrawn Condemned as 31251    
09/2004 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev