Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 236 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 236 Week
» 34811 Month
» 104290 Year
» 1325855 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5679 m/e 09/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 09/1926
Withdrawal During 07/1963
Scrapping During 09/1963
Service Life 36 yrs, 9 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 21/02/1959
86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 28/11/1959
89B Croes Newydd 4w/e 21/04/1962
88C Barry 4w/e 12/01/1963
89B Croes Newydd 4w/e 09/02/1963
84F Stourbridge Junction w/e 30/03/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 89B Croes Newydd 4w/e 21/04/1962
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 12/01/1963
LOAN 89B Croes Newydd 4w/e 09/02/1963
ALLOC 89B Croes Newydd 4w/e 02/03/1963
ALLOC 89B Croes Newydd 4w/e 09/03/1963
ALLOC 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 30/03/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1926 To Service To service as GWR Number 5679
Built at Swindon Works
   
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
28/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
21/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (89B)    
12/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
09/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (89B)    
30/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F)    
07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5679    

prev prev