Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5681 05/01/1961
TOPS (Tops) 31253 26/01/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/205/01/1961
31/108/1965
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 282
Cost when Built £
To Service 05/01/1961
Withdrawn 01/01/1995
Time in Service 33 yrs, 11 mths , 27 dys
Cut Up 07/2003
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 05/01/1961
34G Finsbury Park w/e 12/05/1962
40B Immingham w/e 09/01/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 10/07/1965
31B March w/e 10/10/1970
HO Holbeck (MR) w/e 19/01/1974
YK York (North) 2w/e 12/10/1974
HO Holbeck (MR) w/e 08/03/1975
   Withdrawn 01/01/1995


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
05/01/1961 To Service To service as D5681
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 282
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
12/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
10/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
10/10/1970 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 31253    
19/01/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO)    
12/10/1974 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
08/03/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO)    
01/01/1995 Withdrawn Condemned as 31253    
07/2003 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev