Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 419 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3562 Week
» 13732 Month
» 291528 Year
» 1175909 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5682 12/01/1961
TOPS (Tops) 31254 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/212/01/1961
31/109/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 283
Cost when Built £
To Service 12/01/1961
Withdrawn 01/12/1979
Time in Service 18 yrs, 10 mths , 19 dys
Cut Up 07/1980
Cut At British Rail (at Old Oak Common MPD)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 12/01/1961
34G Finsbury Park w/e 12/05/1962
31B March w/e 15/09/1962
41A Sheffield Darnall w/e 12/01/1963
41A Tinsley 26/04/1964
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 28/08/1965
31B March w/e 11/10/1969
81A Old Oak Common w/e 08/01/1972
BR Bristol Bath Road w/e 06/03/1976
   Withdrawn 01/12/1979

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
09/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
12/1971   Dual AWS Fitted  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
16/11/1962 Not severe   Train heating boiler burners Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
12/01/1961 To Service To service as D5682
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 283
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
12/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
12/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
28/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
09/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/10/1969 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
12/1971 Modification Modification: Dual AWS Fitted    
08/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
11/01/1972 Sightings Locomotives on shed at Old Oak Common: Locomotive on shed at Old Oak Common RO 517 Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31254    
06/03/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
01/12/1979 Withdrawn Condemned as 31254    
07/1980 Scrapped Broken up by British Rail: at Old Oak Common MPD    

prev prev