Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5684 26/01/1961
TOPS (Tops) 31256 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/226/01/1961
31/104/1965
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 285
Cost when Built £
To Service 26/01/1961
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 26/01/1961
41A Tinsley 26/04/1964
81A Old Oak Common w/e 28/10/1972
BR Bristol Bath Road w/e 27/04/1974
OC Old Oak Common 4w/e 10/05/1975

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
10/1970   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
26/01/1961 To Service To service as D5684
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 285
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
26/09/1964 Sightings Waleswood Junction - This log was recorded on the ex-M.S.&.L. line east of Sheffield.: Passing John Thickitt Link
10/1970 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
28/10/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31256    
27/04/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
10/05/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC)    

prev prev