Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 180 Today
» 911 Yesterday
» 180 Week
» 14084 Month
» 322065 Year
» 1206446 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5686 09/02/1961
TOPS (Tops) 31258 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/209/02/1961
31/111/09/1965
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 287
Cost when Built £
To Service 09/02/1961
Withdrawn 01/11/1998
Time in Service 37 yrs, 8 mths , 23 dys
Cut Up 04/2003
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 09/02/1961
41A Tinsley 26/04/1964
D16 Nottingham Division w/e 27/03/1965
41C Wath w/e 27/03/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 10/04/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 12/06/1965
91M To London Midland Region w/e 23/10/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 06/11/1965
D16 Nottingham Division w/e 13/11/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 27/11/1965
40B Immingham w/e 09/10/1971
81A Old Oak Common w/e 08/07/1972
   Withdrawn 01/11/1998

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
09/1972   Dual AWS Fitted  
12/1974   Dual Braked  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
27/05/1964 Not severe   Not known Oil impregnated dirt or waste    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
09/02/1961 To Service To service as D5686
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 287
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
27/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
27/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
10/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
12/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
23/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
06/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
13/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
27/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
08/07/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
09/1972 Modification Modification: Dual AWS Fitted    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31258    
12/1974 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
28/09/1975 Sightings On Old Oak Common depot - Stabled    
01/11/1998 Withdrawn Condemned as 31258    
04/2003 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev