Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 190 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 190 Week
» 18972 Month
» 267265 Year
» 1151646 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5687 16/02/1961
TOPS (Tops) 31259 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/216/02/1961
31/106/1965
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 288
Cost when Built £
To Service 16/02/1961
Withdrawn 02/03/1989
Time in Service 28 yrs , 14 dys
Cut Up 06/1990
Cut At Vic Berry (Leicester)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 16/02/1961
41A Tinsley 26/04/1964
D16 Nottingham Division w/e 11/09/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 25/09/1965
91E To Eastern Region w/e 06/11/1965
81A Old Oak Common w/e 08/07/1972
   Withdrawn 02/03/1989

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
10/1972   Dual AWS Fitted  
08/1974   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
16/02/1961 To Service To service as D5687
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 288
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
11/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
25/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
06/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E)    
08/07/1972 Allocation Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
12/08/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
10/1972 Modification Modification: Dual AWS Fitted    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31259    
08/1974 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
02/03/1989 Withdrawn Condemned as 31259    
06/1990 Scrapped Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester    

prev prev