Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 163 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2070 Week
» 20852 Month
» 269145 Year
» 1153526 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5688 23/02/1961
TOPS (Tops) 31260 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/223/02/1961
31/105/1966
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 289
Cost when Built £
To Service 23/02/1961
Withdrawn 12/01/1990
Time in Service 28 yrs, 10 mths , 20 dys
Cut Up 09/1991
Cut At MC Metals (Springburn)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 23/02/1961
40A Lincoln w/e 22/02/1964
41A Tinsley w/e 06/11/1965
40B Immingham w/e 05/03/1966
81A Old Oak Common w/e 08/01/1972
BR Bristol Bath Road 2w/e 18/09/1976
TE Thornaby w/e 15/05/1988
   Withdrawn 12/01/1990

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
05/1966   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
12/1971   Dual AWS Fitted  
12/1982   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
23/02/1961 To Service To service as D5688
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 289
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
22/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
06/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
05/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
05/1966 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
12/1971 Modification Modification: Dual AWS Fitted    
08/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
11/01/1972 Sightings Locomotives on shed at Old Oak Common: Locomotive on shed at Old Oak Common RO 517 Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31260    
18/09/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
12/1982 Modification Modification: Dual Braked    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (TE)    
12/01/1990 Withdrawn Condemned as 31260    
09/1991 Scrapped Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn    

prev prev