Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 565 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 13971 Week
» 66987 Month
» 186514 Year
» 3213367 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5691 |
16/03/1961 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31411 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/5) |
31511 |
30/05/1990 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
16/03/1961 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1966 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
11/02/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/03/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
11/02/1972 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
0000 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
Not Known |
|
0000 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
Freight working |
|
10/10/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/03/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5691 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 292 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
08/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
12/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
05/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
05/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
11/02/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/03/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31411 |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
30/05/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31511 |
|
|
11/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham |
|
|
30/11/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31511 |
|
|