Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 5101 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20713 Week
» 119358 Month
» 322022 Year
» 3348875 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5693 |
30/03/1961 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31263 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
30/03/1961 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
19/11/1976 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/03/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
19/11/1976 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/03/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5693 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 294 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
08/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
03/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
07/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31263 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
19/11/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/2001 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Kingsbury |
|
|
10/08/2001 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31263 |
|
|