Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 192 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 192 Week
» 18974 Month
» 267267 Year
» 1151648 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5693 30/03/1961
TOPS (Tops) 31263 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/230/03/1961
31/103/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 294
Cost when Built £
To Service 30/03/1961
Withdrawn 10/08/2001
Time in Service 40 yrs, 4 mths , 11 dys
Cut Up 08/2001
Cut At Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 30/03/1961
31B March w/e 08/09/1962
40B Immingham w/e 09/10/1971
MR March 2w/e 12/10/1974
   Withdrawn 10/08/2001

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
03/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
12/1976   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/03/1961 To Service To service as D5693
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 294
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
03/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31263    
12/10/1974 Allocation Reallocated to March (MR)    
12/1976 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
08/2001 Scrapped Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Kingsbury    
10/08/2001 Withdrawn Condemned as 31263    

prev prev