Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5694 13/04/1961
TOPS (Tops) 31264 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/213/04/1961
31/112/1966
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 295
Cost when Built £
To Service 13/04/1961
Withdrawn 08/04/1991
Time in Service 29 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys
Cut Up 04/1995
Cut At MC Metals (Springburn)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 13/04/1961
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 09/10/1965
31B March w/e 11/10/1969
40B Immingham w/e 09/10/1971
TO Toton w/e 23/02/1974
IM Immingham w/e 09/03/1974
FP Finsbury Park 2w/e 30/11/1974
TE Thornaby w/e 15/05/1988
   Withdrawn 08/04/1991

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
12/1966   Reclassified from 30 to 31  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
13/04/1961 To Service To service as D5694
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 295
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
12/1966 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/10/1969 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31264    
23/02/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (TO)    
09/03/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IM)    
30/11/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP)    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (TE)    
08/04/1991 Withdrawn Condemned as 31264    
04/1995 Scrapped Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn    

prev prev