Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 267 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 7727 Week
» 5240 Month
» 233124 Year
» 1454689 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5696 04/05/1961  
TOPS (Tops) 31266 12/01/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/204/05/1961
31/111/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 297
To Service 04/05/1961
Withdrawn 01/12/1992
Time in Service 31 yrs, 6 mths , 27 dys
Cut Up 01/2007
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 04/05/1961
31B March w/e 23/06/1962
30A Stratford w/e 09/01/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 15/04/1967
31B March w/e 23/05/1970
52A Gateshead w/e 09/10/1971
51L Thornaby w/e 08/01/1972
40B Immingham w/e 08/07/1972
MR March w/e 12/01/1974
   Withdrawn 01/12/1992

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31B March 2w/e 23/06/1962
ALLOC 30A Stratford 6w/e 09/01/1965
ALLOC 41A Tinsley 4w/e 29/04/1967
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 30/05/1970
ALLOC MR March 5w/e 02/02/1974

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
11/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
04/05/1961 To Service To service as D5696
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 297
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
15/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
11/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
23/05/1970 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
08/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
08/07/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
01/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 31266    
12/01/1974 Allocation Reallocated to March (MR)    
01/12/1992 Withdrawn Condemned as 31266    
01/2007 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev