Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5697 11/05/1961
TOPS (31/4) 31419 30/04/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/211/05/1961
31/126/06/1965
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 298
Cost when Built £
To Service 11/05/1961
Withdrawn 01/12/1995
Time in Service 34 yrs, 6 mths , 20 dys
Cut Up 03/2001
Cut At English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 11/05/1961
31B March w/e 23/06/1962
30A Stratford w/e 09/01/1965
31B March w/e 08/10/1966
41A Tinsley w/e 29/03/1969
31B March w/e 10/10/1970
91M To London Midland Region 2w/e 29/12/1973
CW Cricklewood East w/e 29/12/1973
OC Old Oak Common w/e 11/10/1975
91W To Western Region / GWR w/e 11/10/1975
   Withdrawn 01/12/1995

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
05/1974   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
11/05/1961 To Service To service as D5697
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 298
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
08/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
29/03/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
10/10/1970 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31419    
29/12/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW)    
29/12/1973 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
05/1974 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
11/10/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC)    
11/10/1975 Allocation Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
01/12/1995 Withdrawn Condemned as 31419    
03/2001 Scrapped Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan    

prev prev