Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 163 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2070 Week
» 20852 Month
» 269145 Year
» 1153526 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5698 18/05/1961
TOPS (Tops) 31268 02/02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/218/05/1961
31/102/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 299
Cost when Built £
To Service 18/05/1961
Withdrawn 11/02/2000
Time in Service 38 yrs, 8 mths , 24 dys
Cut Up 03/2000
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 18/05/1961
31B March w/e 23/06/1962
30A Stratford w/e 09/01/1965
34G Finsbury Park w/e 03/04/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 19/06/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 17/07/1965
31B March w/e 09/10/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 06/11/1965
40B Immingham w/e 12/02/1966
HO Holbeck (MR) w/e 16/05/1976
   Withdrawn 11/02/2000

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
02/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
11/1972   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
18/05/1961 To Service To service as D5698
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 299
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
03/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
17/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
06/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
12/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
02/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/1972 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31268    
16/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO)    
11/02/2000 Withdrawn Condemned as 31268    
03/2000 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev