Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 828 Today
» 1236 Yesterday
» 5799 Week
» 20376 Month
» 383621 Year
» 460208 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5700 25/07/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 28
Wheels Co-Bo
Builder Metropolitan Vickers
To Service 25/07/1958
Withdrawn 30/12/1967
Time in Service 9 yrs, 5 mths , 5 dys
Cut Up 09/1968
Cut At J McWilliams (Shettleston)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby (New) 25/07/1958
   Stored (Trafford Park (LMS)) m/e 01/1961
   Stored (Cricklewood East) m/e 02/1961
12E Barrow in Furness (Reinstated) w/e 03/02/1962
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 16/10/1965
   Withdrawn 30/12/1967


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Derby Works 07/08/1959 18/09/1959 43 days Light Casual  
Derby Works 24/03/1960 10/06/1960 79 days Light Casual  
Metropolitan Vickers 19/10/1961 30/08/1962 316 days Heavy Casual  

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
25/07/1958 To Service To service as D5700
Built at Metropolitan Vickers
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
07/08/1959 18/09/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/08/1959. Dep: 18/09/1959.    
24/03/1960 10/06/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/03/1960. Dep: 10/06/1960.    
01/1961 To Store To Store at Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
02/1961 To Store To Store at Cricklewood East (14A)    
19/10/1961 30/08/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Metropolitan Vickers (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 19/10/1961. Dep: 30/08/1962.    
03/02/1962 Reinstated Reinstated to Barrow in Furness (12E)    
09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12C)    
16/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D5700    
30/12/1967 07/1968 Sightings Dumped at Carlisle Kingmoor Harris  
07/1968 11/1968 Sightings Dumped at McWilliams, Shettleston Harris  
09/1968 Scrapped Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston    

prev