Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 828 Today
» 1236 Yesterday
» 5799 Week
» 20376 Month
» 383621 Year
» 460208 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5701 01/09/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 28
Wheels Co-Bo
Builder Metropolitan Vickers
To Service 01/09/1958
Withdrawn 07/09/1968
Time in Service 10 yrs , 6 dys
Cut Up 10/1969
Cut At Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby (New) 01/09/1958
12E Barrow in Furness w/e 03/02/1962
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 16/10/1965
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 17/02/1968
D10 Preston Division 17/06/1968
   Withdrawn 07/09/1968

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/12/1960 Wrap round windscreens replaced with flat ones.
 
 


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Derby Works 19/09/1958 22/09/1958 4 days Heavy Casual  
Derby Works 22/08/1960 12/11/1960 83 days Light Casual  
Derby Works 15/11/1960 29/11/1960 15 days Unclassified  
Metropolitan Vickers 19/10/1961 17/08/1962 303 days Heavy Casual  
Horwich Works 25/03/1963 31/05/1963 68 days Heavy Casual  

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
01/09/1958 To Service To service as D5701
Built at Metropolitan Vickers
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
19/09/1958 22/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 19/09/1958. Dep: 22/09/1958.    
22/08/1960 12/11/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/08/1960. Dep: 12/11/1960.    
15/11/1960 29/11/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/11/1960. Dep: 29/11/1960.    
19/10/1961 17/08/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Metropolitan Vickers (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 19/10/1961. Dep: 17/08/1962.    
03/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E)    
25/03/1963 31/05/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Horwich Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 25/03/1963. Dep: 31/05/1963.    
16/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
17/02/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Preston Division (D10)    
07/09/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D5701    
15/09/1969 Sightings Booked to travel from Carlisle to J Cashmore, Great Bridge scrapyard - With D5702/6 RO489 11/69  
10/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev