Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 873 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 873 Week
» 23854 Month
» 387099 Year
» 463686 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5702 29/09/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 28
Wheels Co-Bo
Builder Metropolitan Vickers
To Service 29/09/1958
Withdrawn 07/09/1968
Time in Service 9 yrs, 11 mths , 9 dys
Cut Up 10/1969
Cut At Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby (New) 29/09/1958
12E Barrow in Furness w/e 03/02/1962
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 16/10/1965
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 17/02/1968
D10 Preston Division 17/06/1968
   Withdrawn 07/09/1968


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Derby Works 27/04/1959 21/05/1959 25 days Heavy Casual  
Derby Works 20/08/1960 25/10/1960 67 days Light Casual  
Metropolitan Vickers 16/10/1961 19/12/1962 430 days Heavy Casual  

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
29/09/1958 To Service To service as D5702
Built at Metropolitan Vickers
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
27/04/1959 21/05/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 27/04/1959. Dep: 21/05/1959.    
20/08/1960 25/10/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/08/1960. Dep: 25/10/1960.    
16/10/1961 19/12/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Metropolitan Vickers (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 16/10/1961. Dep: 19/12/1962.    
03/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E)    
04/07/1963 Sightings Worked the 09:50 Manchester Victoria to Workington service, leaving from MV Platform 11 BR Fleet Survey Vol. 1  
16/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
17/02/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Preston Division (D10)    
09/1968 09/1969 Sightings Stored after condemnation at Carlisle Kingmoor A.K.Butlin: Diesel Disposal Vol 2  
07/09/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D5702    
15/09/1969 Sightings Booked to travel from Carlisle to J Cashmore, Great Bridge scrapyard - With D5701/6 RO489 11/69  
10/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev