Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 582 Today
» 1134 Yesterday
» 1716 Week
» 21449 Month
» 318463 Year
» 395050 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5703 20/10/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 28
Wheels Co-Bo
Builder Metropolitan Vickers
To Service 20/10/1958
Withdrawn 30/12/1967
Time in Service 9 yrs, 2 mths , 10 dys
Cut Up 06/1968
Cut At J McWilliams (Shettleston)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby (New) 20/10/1958
12E Barrow in Furness w/e 03/02/1962
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 16/10/1965
   Withdrawn 30/12/1967


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Derby Works 03/04/1959 04/05/1959 32 days Light Casual  
St. Rollox Works 12/09/1959 26/09/1959 15 days Light Casual  
Metropolitan Vickers 18/09/1961 23/05/1962 248 days Heavy Casual  

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
20/10/1958 To Service To service as D5703
Built at Metropolitan Vickers
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
03/04/1959 04/05/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/04/1959. Dep: 04/05/1959.    
12/09/1959 26/09/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/09/1959. Dep: 26/09/1959.    
18/09/1961 23/05/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Metropolitan Vickers (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 18/09/1961. Dep: 23/05/1962.    
03/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E)    
16/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D5703    
06/1968 Scrapped Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston    

prev prev