Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 871 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 871 Week
» 23852 Month
» 387097 Year
» 463684 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5704 05/11/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 28
Wheels Co-Bo
Builder Metropolitan Vickers
To Service 05/11/1958
Withdrawn 30/12/1967
Time in Service 9 yrs, 1 mth , 25 dys
Cut Up 08/1968
Cut At J McWilliams (Shettleston)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby (New) 05/11/1958
12E Barrow in Furness w/e 03/02/1962
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/12/1966
   Withdrawn 30/12/1967

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/10/1960 Wrap round windscreens replaced with flat ones.
 
 


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Derby Works 08/07/1960 21/09/1960 76 days Light Casual  
Metropolitan Vickers 18/09/1961 08/06/1962 264 days Heavy Casual  
Metropolitan Vickers 06/08/1962 14/08/1962 9 days Unclassified  

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
05/11/1958 To Service To service as D5704
Built at Metropolitan Vickers
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
08/07/1960 21/09/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/07/1960. Dep: 21/09/1960.    
18/09/1961 08/06/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Metropolitan Vickers (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 18/09/1961. Dep: 08/06/1962.    
03/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E)    
06/08/1962 14/08/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Metropolitan Vickers (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/08/1962. Dep: 14/08/1962.    
17/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D5704    
08/1968 Scrapped Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston    

prev prev