Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 165 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17968 Week
» 70984 Month
» 190511 Year
» 3217364 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5704 |
05/11/1958 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/10/1960 |
|
Wrap round windscreens replaced with flat ones. |
|
£142/12/10 |
£31/7/2 |
£174/-/- |
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/11/1958 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
19/05/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Not known |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
13/11/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Derby Works |
|
n/a |
08/07/1960 |
21/09/1960 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
76 days |
|
|
|
Metropolitan Vickers |
|
n/a |
18/09/1961 |
08/06/1962 |
Heavy Casual |
|
|
|
264 days |
|
|
|
Metropolitan Vickers |
|
n/a |
06/08/1962 |
14/08/1962 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
9 days |
|
|
|
Performance Statistics (Form E.R.O 3666)
Year |
Annual Mileage |
Cumulative Mileage |
Fuel Oil Utilised |
Approximate Miles/Gallon |
Classified Wait Repair |
Classified Wait Works |
Classified On Works |
Classified Total (Wkdys) |
Running Repairs |
Running Repair & Exams Cost |
Wkdys Not Required for Service |
Wkdys Stored Serviceable |
Wkdys Stored Unserviceable |
Total Weekdays Unavailable |
1958 |
6,187 |
6,187 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1959 |
48,436 |
54,623 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1960 |
29,114 |
83,737 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1961 |
0 |
83,737 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1962 |
23,224 |
106,961 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1963 |
48,283 |
155,244 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/11/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5704 Built at Metropolitan Vickers Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
08/07/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/07/1960. Dep: 21/09/1960. |
|
|
08/10/1960 |
Modification |
Modification: Wrap round windscreens replaced with flat ones. |
|
|
18/09/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Metropolitan Vickers (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 18/09/1961. Dep: 08/06/1962. |
|
|
03/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E) |
|
|
06/08/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Metropolitan Vickers (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/08/1962. Dep: 14/08/1962. |
|
|
17/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
30/12/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5704 from Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |
|
|