Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 309 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 3771 Week
» 23504 Month
» 320518 Year
» 397105 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5705 05/12/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 28
Wheels Co-Bo
Builder Metropolitan Vickers
To Service 05/12/1958
Withdrawn 07/09/1968
Time in Service 9 yrs, 9 mths , 2 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby (New) 05/12/1958
12E Barrow in Furness w/e 03/02/1962
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/12/1966
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 17/02/1968
D10 Preston Division 17/06/1968
   Withdrawn 07/09/1968

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Derby Works 04/12/1959 13/01/1960 41 days Unclassified  
Derby Works 10/11/1960 21/01/1961 73 days Light Casual  
Metropolitan Vickers 16/10/1961 27/06/1962 255 days Heavy Casual  

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
05/12/1958 To Service To service as D5705
Built at Metropolitan Vickers
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
04/12/1959 13/01/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/12/1959. Dep: 13/01/1960.    
10/11/1960 21/01/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/11/1960. Dep: 21/01/1961.    
16/10/1961 27/06/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Metropolitan Vickers (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 16/10/1961. Dep: 27/06/1962.    
03/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E)    
17/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
17/02/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Preston Division (D10)    
07/09/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D5705    

prev prev