Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2033 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15439 Week
» 68455 Month
» 187982 Year
» 3214835 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5705 |
05/12/1958 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
28/01/1961 |
|
Wrap round windscreens replaced with flat ones. |
|
£142/12/10 |
£31/7/2 |
£174/-/- |
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/12/1958 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Derby Works |
|
n/a |
04/12/1959 |
13/01/1960 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
41 days |
|
|
|
Derby Works |
|
n/a |
10/11/1960 |
21/01/1961 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
73 days |
|
|
|
Metropolitan Vickers |
|
n/a |
16/10/1961 |
27/06/1962 |
Heavy Casual |
|
|
|
255 days |
|
|
|
Performance Statistics (Form E.R.O 3666)
Year |
Annual Mileage |
Cumulative Mileage |
Fuel Oil Utilised |
Approximate Miles/Gallon |
Classified Wait Repair |
Classified Wait Works |
Classified On Works |
Classified Total (Wkdys) |
Running Repairs |
Running Repair & Exams Cost |
Wkdys Not Required for Service |
Wkdys Stored Serviceable |
Wkdys Stored Unserviceable |
Total Weekdays Unavailable |
1958 |
3,606 |
3,606 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1959 |
40,445 |
44,051 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1960 |
52,507 |
96,558 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1961 |
10,926 |
107,484 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1962 |
23,874 |
131,358 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1963 |
38,472 |
169,830 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/12/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5705 Built at Metropolitan Vickers Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
04/12/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/12/1959. Dep: 13/01/1960. |
|
|
10/11/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/11/1960. Dep: 21/01/1961. |
|
|
28/01/1961 |
Modification |
Modification: Wrap round windscreens replaced with flat ones. |
|
|
16/10/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Metropolitan Vickers (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 16/10/1961. Dep: 27/06/1962. |
|
|
03/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E) |
|
|
17/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
17/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
07/09/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5705 from Preston Division (D10) |
|
|