Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 1028 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18831 Week
» 71847 Month
» 191374 Year
» 3218227 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5707 |
19/12/1958 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/12/1958 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Metropolitan Vickers |
|
n/a |
19/06/1961 |
29/03/1962 |
Heavy Casual |
|
|
|
284 days |
|
|
|
Performance Statistics (Form E.R.O 3666)
Year |
Annual Mileage |
Cumulative Mileage |
Fuel Oil Utilised |
Approximate Miles/Gallon |
Classified Wait Repair |
Classified Wait Works |
Classified On Works |
Classified Total (Wkdys) |
Running Repairs |
Running Repair & Exams Cost |
Wkdys Not Required for Service |
Wkdys Stored Serviceable |
Wkdys Stored Unserviceable |
Total Weekdays Unavailable |
1958 |
574 |
574 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1959 |
34,349 |
34,923 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1960 |
7,964 |
42,887 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1961 |
69 |
42,956 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1962 |
32,535 |
75,491 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1963 |
56,819 |
132,310 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/12/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5707 Built at Metropolitan Vickers Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
19/06/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Metropolitan Vickers (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 19/06/1961. Dep: 29/03/1962. |
|
|
03/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E) |
|
|
17/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
17/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
07/09/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5707 from Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
10/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|