Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 828 Today
» 1236 Yesterday
» 5799 Week
» 20376 Month
» 383621 Year
» 460208 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5709 10/01/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 28
Wheels Co-Bo
Builder Metropolitan Vickers
To Service 10/01/1959
Withdrawn 30/12/1967
Time in Service 8 yrs, 11 mths , 20 dys
Cut Up 10/1968
Cut At J McWilliams (Shettleston)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby (New) 10/01/1959
12E Barrow in Furness w/e 03/02/1962
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/12/1966
   Withdrawn 30/12/1967


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Metropolitan Vickers 05/06/1961 23/02/1962 264 days Heavy Casual  

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
10/01/1959 To Service To service as D5709
Built at Metropolitan Vickers
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
05/06/1961 23/02/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Metropolitan Vickers (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 05/06/1961. Dep: 23/02/1962.    
03/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E)    
17/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D5709    
10/1968 Scrapped Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston    

prev prev