Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 816 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14222 Week
» 67238 Month
» 186765 Year
» 3213618 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5709 |
10/01/1959 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/01/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Metropolitan Vickers |
|
n/a |
05/06/1961 |
23/02/1962 |
Heavy Casual |
|
|
|
264 days |
|
|
|
Performance Statistics (Form E.R.O 3666)
Year |
Annual Mileage |
Cumulative Mileage |
Fuel Oil Utilised |
Approximate Miles/Gallon |
Classified Wait Repair |
Classified Wait Works |
Classified On Works |
Classified Total (Wkdys) |
Running Repairs |
Running Repair & Exams Cost |
Wkdys Not Required for Service |
Wkdys Stored Serviceable |
Wkdys Stored Unserviceable |
Total Weekdays Unavailable |
1959 |
46,299 |
46,299 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1960 |
16,872 |
63,171 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1961 |
63,171 |
63,171 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1962 |
35,495 |
98,666 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1963 |
54,075 |
152,741 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/01/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5709 Built at Metropolitan Vickers Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
05/06/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Metropolitan Vickers (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 05/06/1961. Dep: 23/02/1962. |
|
|
03/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E) |
|
|
17/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
30/12/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5709 from Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
10/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |
|
|