Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 314 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 3776 Week
» 23509 Month
» 320523 Year
» 397110 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5710 14/02/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 28
Wheels Co-Bo
Builder Metropolitan Vickers
To Service 14/02/1959
Withdrawn 30/12/1967
Time in Service 8 yrs, 10 mths , 16 dys
Cut Up 09/1968
Cut At J McWilliams (Shettleston)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby (New) 14/02/1959
12E Barrow in Furness w/e 03/02/1962
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/12/1966
   Withdrawn 30/12/1967

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
28/01/1961 Wrap round windscreens replaced with flat ones.
 


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Derby Works 26/01/1960 28/03/1960 63 days Unclassified  
Derby Works 26/07/1960 15/08/1960 21 days Unclassified  
Derby Works 18/10/1960 02/01/1961 77 days Light Casual  
Metropolitan Vickers 18/09/1961 08/06/1962 264 days Heavy Casual  

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
14/02/1959 To Service To service as D5710
Built at Metropolitan Vickers
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
26/01/1960 28/03/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/01/1960. Dep: 28/03/1960.    
26/07/1960 15/08/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/07/1960. Dep: 15/08/1960.    
18/10/1960 02/01/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/10/1960. Dep: 02/01/1961.    
18/09/1961 08/06/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Metropolitan Vickers (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 18/09/1961. Dep: 08/06/1962.    
03/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E)    
17/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D5710    
09/1968 Scrapped Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston    

prev prev