Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 830 Today
» 1236 Yesterday
» 5801 Week
» 20378 Month
» 383623 Year
» 460210 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5712 07/03/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 28
Wheels Co-Bo
Builder Metropolitan Vickers
To Service 07/03/1959
Withdrawn 07/09/1968
Time in Service 9 yrs , 6 mths
Cut Up 12/1969
Cut At Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby (New) 07/03/1959
14A Cricklewood East w/e 30/01/1960
17A Derby w/e 02/07/1960
12E Barrow in Furness w/e 03/02/1962
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/12/1966
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 17/02/1968
D10 Preston Division 17/06/1968
   Withdrawn 07/09/1968


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Derby Works 08/12/1959 15/12/1959 8 days Unclassified  
Metropolitan Vickers 10/07/1961 18/05/1962 313 days Heavy Casual  
Horwich Works 03/08/1963 20/08/1963 18 days Light Casual  

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
07/03/1959 To Service To service as D5712
Built at Metropolitan Vickers
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
08/12/1959 15/12/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/12/1959. Dep: 15/12/1959.    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
02/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
10/07/1961 18/05/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Metropolitan Vickers (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 10/07/1961. Dep: 18/05/1962.    
03/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E)    
03/08/1963 20/08/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Horwich Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/08/1963. Dep: 20/08/1963.    
17/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
17/02/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Preston Division (D10)    
07/09/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D5712    
20/09/1969 Sightings Noted in Carlisle Kingmoor Yard: Dead RO489 11/69 Link
12/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev