Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2548 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15954 Week
» 68970 Month
» 188497 Year
» 3215350 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5714 |
14/03/1959 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/01/1960 |
R.9951 |
Vacuum Trip Gear |
|
£67/14/- |
|
£67/14/- |
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/03/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
26/07/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Derby Works |
|
n/a |
25/03/1959 |
20/04/1959 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
27 days |
|
|
|
Derby Works |
|
n/a |
18/12/1959 |
29/12/1959 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
12 days |
|
|
|
Metropolitan Vickers |
|
n/a |
23/10/1961 |
08/11/1962 |
Heavy Casual |
|
|
|
382 days |
|
|
|
Performance Statistics (Form E.R.O 3666)
Year |
Annual Mileage |
Cumulative Mileage |
Fuel Oil Utilised |
Approximate Miles/Gallon |
Classified Wait Repair |
Classified Wait Works |
Classified On Works |
Classified Total (Wkdys) |
Running Repairs |
Running Repair & Exams Cost |
Wkdys Not Required for Service |
Wkdys Stored Serviceable |
Wkdys Stored Unserviceable |
Total Weekdays Unavailable |
1959 |
39,230 |
39,230 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1960 |
40,539 |
79,769 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1961 |
9,083 |
88,852 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1962 |
5,054 |
93,906 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1963 |
50,464 |
144,370 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/03/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5714 Built at Metropolitan Vickers Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
25/03/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/03/1959. Dep: 20/04/1959. |
|
|
18/12/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/12/1959. Dep: 29/12/1959. |
|
|
02/01/1960 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Trip Gear |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
22/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
23/10/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Metropolitan Vickers (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 23/10/1961. Dep: 08/11/1962. |
|
|
03/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E) |
|
|
16/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
17/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
07/09/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5714 from Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
09/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|