Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 612 Today
» 1259 Yesterday
» 1871 Week
» 24852 Month
» 388097 Year
» 464684 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5715 11/04/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 28
Wheels Co-Bo
Builder Metropolitan Vickers
To Service 11/04/1959
Withdrawn 04/05/1968 off Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)
Time in Service 9 yrs , 23 dys
Cut Up 09/1968
Cut At J McWilliams (Shettleston)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby (New) 11/04/1959
14A Cricklewood East w/e 30/01/1960
17A Derby w/e 22/10/1960
12E Barrow in Furness w/e 03/02/1962
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 16/10/1965
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 17/02/1968
   Withdrawn 04/05/1968


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Derby Works 15/01/1959 01/05/1959 107 days Light Casual  
Derby Works 23/12/1959 24/12/1959 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 16/10/1961 28/03/1963 529 days Heavy Casual  

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
15/01/1959 01/05/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/01/1959. Dep: 01/05/1959.    
11/04/1959 To Service To service as D5715
Built at Metropolitan Vickers
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
23/12/1959 24/12/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/12/1959. Dep: 24/12/1959.    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
22/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
16/10/1961 28/03/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 16/10/1961. Dep: 28/03/1963.    
03/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E)    
16/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
17/02/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
04/05/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D5715 from Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
09/1968 Scrapped Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston    

prev prev