Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 828 Today
» 1236 Yesterday
» 5799 Week
» 20376 Month
» 383621 Year
» 460208 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5716 16/05/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 28
Wheels Co-Bo
Builder Metropolitan Vickers
To Service 16/05/1959
Withdrawn 07/09/1968
Time in Service 9 yrs, 3 mths , 22 dys
Cut Up 12/1969
Cut At Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby (New) 16/05/1959
14A Cricklewood East w/e 30/01/1960
17A Derby w/e 13/08/1960
12E Barrow in Furness w/e 03/02/1962
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 16/10/1965
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 17/02/1968
D10 Preston Division 17/06/1968
   Withdrawn 07/09/1968


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Derby Works 10/12/1959 18/12/1959 9 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 18/10/1962 05/10/1963 353 days Heavy Casual  

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
16/05/1959 To Service To service as D5716
Built at Metropolitan Vickers
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
10/12/1959 18/12/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/12/1959. Dep: 18/12/1959.    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
13/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
03/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E)    
18/10/1962 05/10/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 18/10/1962. Dep: 05/10/1963.    
16/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
17/02/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Preston Division (D10)    
07/09/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D5716    
17/09/1969 Sightings Booked to travel from Carlisle to J Cashmore, Great Bridge scrapyard - With D5717 RO489 11/69  
12/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev