Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1377 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14783 Week
» 67799 Month
» 187326 Year
» 3214179 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5716 |
16/05/1959 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
26/12/1959 |
R.9951 |
Vacuum Trip Gear |
|
£67/14/- |
|
£67/14/- |
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/05/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Derby Works |
|
n/a |
10/12/1959 |
18/12/1959 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
9 days |
|
|
|
Gorton Works |
|
n/a |
18/10/1962 |
05/10/1963 |
Heavy Casual |
|
|
|
353 days |
|
|
|
Performance Statistics (Form E.R.O 3666)
Year |
Annual Mileage |
Cumulative Mileage |
Fuel Oil Utilised |
Approximate Miles/Gallon |
Classified Wait Repair |
Classified Wait Works |
Classified On Works |
Classified Total (Wkdys) |
Running Repairs |
Running Repair & Exams Cost |
Wkdys Not Required for Service |
Wkdys Stored Serviceable |
Wkdys Stored Unserviceable |
Total Weekdays Unavailable |
1959 |
30,149 |
30,149 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1960 |
33,267 |
63,416 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1961 |
231 |
63,647 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1962 |
10,709 |
74,356 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1963 |
49,330 |
123,686 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/05/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5716 Built at Metropolitan Vickers Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
10/12/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/12/1959. Dep: 18/12/1959. |
|
|
26/12/1959 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Trip Gear |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
13/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
03/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E) |
|
|
18/10/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 18/10/1962. Dep: 05/10/1963. |
|
|
16/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
17/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
07/09/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5716 from Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
12/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|