Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 868 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 868 Week
» 23849 Month
» 387094 Year
» 463681 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5717 19/06/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 28
Wheels Co-Bo
Builder Metropolitan Vickers
To Service 19/06/1959
Withdrawn 07/09/1968
Time in Service 9 yrs, 2 mths , 19 dys
Cut Up 10/1969
Cut At Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby (New) 19/06/1959
14A Cricklewood East w/e 30/01/1960
17A Derby w/e 06/08/1960
12E Barrow in Furness w/e 03/02/1962
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/12/1966
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 17/02/1968
D10 Preston Division 17/06/1968
   Withdrawn 07/09/1968


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Derby Works 18/12/1959 29/12/1959 12 days Unclassified  
Derby Works 20/06/1960 01/07/1960 12 days Unclassified  
Derby Works 17/07/1960 20/10/1960 96 days Light Casual  
Metropolitan Vickers 16/10/1961 23/01/1962 69 days Heavy Casual  
Crewe Works 27/01/1964 02/05/1964 97 days Unclassified  

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
19/06/1959 To Service To service as D5717
Built at Metropolitan Vickers
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
18/12/1959 29/12/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/12/1959. Dep: 29/12/1959.    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
20/06/1960 01/07/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/06/1960. Dep: 01/07/1960.    
17/07/1960 20/10/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/07/1960. Dep: 20/10/1960.    
06/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
16/10/1961 23/01/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Metropolitan Vickers (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 16/10/1961. Dep: 23/01/1961.    
03/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E)    
27/01/1964 02/05/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/01/1964. Dep: 02/05/1964.    
17/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
17/02/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Preston Division (D10)    
07/09/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D5717    
17/09/1969 Sightings Booked to travel from Carlisle to J Cashmore, Great Bridge scrapyard - With D5716 RO489 11/69  
10/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev