Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 582 Today
» 1134 Yesterday
» 1716 Week
» 21449 Month
» 318463 Year
» 395050 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5719 17/10/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 28
Wheels Co-Bo
Builder Metropolitan Vickers
To Service 17/10/1959
Withdrawn 07/09/1968
Time in Service 8 yrs, 10 mths , 21 dys
Cut Up 09/1969
Cut At Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby (New) 17/10/1959
14A Cricklewood East w/e 30/01/1960
17A Derby w/e 06/08/1960
12E Barrow in Furness w/e 30/12/1961
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/12/1966
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 17/02/1968
D10 Preston Division 17/06/1968
   Withdrawn 07/09/1968


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Derby Works 13/12/1959 18/12/1959 5 days Unclassified  
Metropolitan Vickers 13/05/1961 21/12/1961 223 days Heavy Casual  
Crewe Works 07/03/1964 04/09/1964 182 days Unclassified  

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
17/10/1959 To Service To service as D5719
Built at Metropolitan Vickers
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
12/12/1959 08/12/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/12/1959. Dep: 08/12/1959.    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
06/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
13/05/1961 21/12/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Metropolitan Vickers (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 13/05/1961. Dep: 21/12/1961.    
30/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E)    
07/03/1964 04/09/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/03/1964. Dep: 04/09/1964.    
17/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
17/02/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Preston Division (D10)    
07/09/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D5719    
09/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    
18/09/1969 Sightings Booked to travel from Carlisle to J Cashmore, Great Bridge scrapyard - With D5714 RO489 11/69  

prev