Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 456 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6432 Week
» 12566 Month
» 240450 Year
» 1462015 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5756 m/e 05/1929

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 258
To Service During 05/1929
Withdrawal During 09/1961
Scrapping During 03/1962 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 32 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1929
ABEEG Aberbeeg 8w/e 23/03/1946
86G Pontypool Road 6w/e 30/06/1952
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ABEEG Aberbeeg 4w/e 23/02/1946
ALLOC TDU Tondu 4w/e 06/09/1947
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 14/06/1952
WDN   m/e 30/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1948 Swindon Works New work August: No. 7016 CDF, 7017 G. J. Churchward PDN; 7430/32 STB, 7431/33 CNYD, 7434. No. 4160 is nearing completion (26/8). Locomotives entering Works during August included: Nos. *100A1, 1018, 1461, 1934/57, 2144, 2340, 2746/64, 2882, 2938/39, 3613/76, 3823/25/57, *3902, *3953, 4045/85, 4119, 4269, 4552, 4671, *4802, *4850, *4852, 4902/14/20/25/28/69/76, 5006/39/63/64/84, 5107/83, 5261, 5325, 5416/20, 5540, 5756, 5932/71/80/93, 6000/08/10/22, 6311/33/85, 6433. 6746, 6849/79, 6945/60, 7206/30, 7726/82, 7800/15, 8104, **8393, 8709, 9301. *Oil-burning. **Converted to 53XX. Works' pilots of late have been: Nos. 212 (since sent for scrap, w/e 21/8), 906, 1713, 1900, 2751 SLS/194810

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1929 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5756
Built at Swindon Works
   
23/03/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Aberbeeg (ABEEG)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 5756    

prev prev