Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 221 Today
» 1182 Yesterday
» 4858 Week
» 16151 Month
» 280784 Year
» 1502349 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5757 m/e 05/1929

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 258
To Service During 05/1929
Withdrawal Wed 30/11/1960
Scrapping During 01/1970
Service Life 31 yrs , 7 mths
Information Saw further use afer withdrawal with London Transport

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1929
82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 24/01/1953
82D Westbury 4w/e 21/03/1953
   Withdrawn on 30/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC WES Westbury 4w/e 17/05/1947
ALLOC 82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 24/01/1953
ALLOC 82D Westbury 4w/e 21/03/1953
OFFSTOCK UNK   m/e 31/12/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1929 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5757
Built at Swindon Works
   
24/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (82F)    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
12/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 5757    

prev prev