Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 217 Today
» 1225 Yesterday
» 217 Week
» 11764 Month
» 411446 Year
» 488033 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5775   09/1929

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 09/1929
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 09/02/1963
Service Life 33 yrs, 5 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
87G Carmarthen 4w/e 01/11/1952
86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 24/03/1956
   Withdrawn 4w/e 09/02/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 24/03/1956
REINS 86G Pontypool Road 30/01/1963
WDN   4w/e 09/02/1963
OFFSTOCK UNK   14/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1929 To Service To service as GWR Number 5775
Built at Swindon Works
   
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
09/02/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5775    

prev prev