Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 777 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 4394 Week
» 16099 Month
» 347588 Year
» 424175 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5800 01/06/1961
TOPS (Tops) 31270 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/201/06/1961
31/107/1966
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 301
To Service 01/06/1961
Withdrawn 26/05/2000
Time in Service 38 yrs, 11 mths , 25 dys
Cut Up 31/05/2000
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) 01/06/1961
55A Holbeck (MR) 2w/e 10/03/1973
YK York (North) w/e 12/01/1974
TI Tinsley w/e 08/03/1975
   Withdrawn 26/05/2000

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
01/06/1961 To Service To service as D5800
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 301
Allocated to March (31B)
   
07/1966 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31270    
10/03/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
12/01/1974 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
08/03/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
26/05/2000 Withdrawn Condemned as 31270    

prev prev