Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 26 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 6241 Week
» 17946 Month
» 349435 Year
» 426022 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5801 08/06/1961
TOPS (Tops) 31271 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/208/06/1961
31/103/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 302
To Service 08/06/1961
Withdrawn 01/05/1997
Time in Service 35 yrs, 10 mths , 23 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 08/06/1961
31B March w/e 23/06/1962
40A Lincoln w/e 17/08/1963
40B Immingham w/e 17/05/1969
41A Tinsley w/e 07/03/1970
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 07/10/1972
   Withdrawn 01/05/1997

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
08/06/1961 To Service To service as D5801
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 302
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
17/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
03/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
17/05/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
07/03/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
07/10/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31271    
01/05/1997 Withdrawn Condemned as 31271    

prev prev