Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 1016 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3115 Week
» 14686 Month
» 262979 Year
» 1147360 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5802 15/06/1961
TOPS (Tops) 31272 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/215/06/1961
31/110/1966
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 303
Cost when Built £
To Service 15/06/1961
Withdrawn 15/08/1995
Time in Service 34 yrs , 2 mths
Cut Up 09/1995
Cut At MC Metals (Springburn)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) 15/06/1961
40A Lincoln w/e 24/08/1963
40B Immingham w/e 17/05/1969
34G Finsbury Park w/e 18/09/1971
30A Stratford w/e 09/10/1971
31B March w/e 12/02/1972
30A Stratford w/e 07/10/1972
HO Holbeck (MR) 3w/e 10/05/1975
YK York (North) 2w/e 11/10/1975
   Withdrawn 15/08/1995

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
10/1966   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
06/1969   Dual Braked  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
08/09/1962 Not severe   Not known Not known    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
15/06/1961 To Service To service as D5802
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 303
Allocated to March (31B)
   
24/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
10/1966 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
17/05/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
06/1969 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
18/09/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
12/02/1972 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
07/10/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31272    
10/05/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO)    
11/10/1975 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
15/08/1995 Withdrawn Condemned as 31272    
09/1995 Scrapped Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn    

prev prev